LA SB278 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
Pending: House Health and Welfare Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 9:00 am in Room 5
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
Pending: House Health and Welfare Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 9:00 am in Room 5
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the Louisiana Pregnancy and Baby Care Initiative. (gov sig) (EG SEE FISC NOTE FF EX)
Title
Creates the Louisiana Pregnancy and Baby Care Initiative. (gov sig) (EG SEE FISC NOTE FF EX)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 278 CO-AUTHORS (#157) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 278 FINAL PASSAGE (#156) (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 278 FINAL PASSAGE (#156) (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2024-03-27 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 3 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |