LA SB293 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
Pending: House Labor and Industrial Relations Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 9:00 am in Room 5
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
Pending: House Labor and Industrial Relations Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 9:00 am in Room 5
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides primary point of contact for workforce solutions. (8/1/24) (RE SEE FISC NOTE See Note)
Title
Provides primary point of contact for workforce solutions. (8/1/24) (RE SEE FISC NOTE See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 293 FINAL PASSAGE (#238) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |
2024-04-10 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |