LA SB3 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Scheduled for floor debate on 05/01/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Scheduled for floor debate on 05/01/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the deferred retirement of a member of the Louisiana Assessors' Retirement Fund. (gov sig) (EG SEE ACTUARIAL NOTE APV)
Title
Provides relative to the deferred retirement of a member of the Louisiana Assessors' Retirement Fund. (gov sig) (EG SEE ACTUARIAL NOTE APV)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 3 FINAL PASSAGE (#79) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/01/2024. |
2024-04-16 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-15 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2024-04-11 | House | Reported favorably (10-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-03-25 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2024-03-21 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement. |