LA SB316 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to charter schools. (gov sig) (RE1 NO IMPACT See Note)
Title
Provides relative to charter schools. (gov sig) (RE1 NO IMPACT See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 316 FINAL PASSAGE (#239) (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-25 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2024-04-24 | House | Reported with amendments (10-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-04-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2024-04-10 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 27 yeas and 10 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |