LA SB342 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
Pending: House Health and Welfare Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 9:00 am in Room 5
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
Pending: House Health and Welfare Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 9:00 am in Room 5
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the Louisiana Tumor Registry. (gov sig) (RE SEE FISC NOTE SG EX)
Title
Provides relative to the Louisiana Tumor Registry. (gov sig) (RE SEE FISC NOTE SG EX)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 342 FINAL PASSAGE (#314) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2024-04-17 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |