LA SB377 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits possession of firearms, ammunition, or electric weapons or devices by certain felons. (8/1/24) (EG1 INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Title
Prohibits possession of firearms, ammunition, or electric weapons or devices by certain felons. (8/1/24) (EG1 INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-25 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 377 FINAL PASSAGE (#126) (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-18 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2024-04-17 | House | Reported with amendments (9-2). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-03-26 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2024-03-25 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 28 yeas and 10 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |