LA SB414 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
Pending: House Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
Pending: House Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the installation and use of newborn safety devices at infant relinquishment sites designated in the Safe Haven Law. (8/1/24) (EG SEE FISC NOTE EX See Note)
Title
Authorizes the installation and use of newborn safety devices at infant relinquishment sites designated in the Safe Haven Law. (8/1/24) (EG SEE FISC NOTE EX See Note)
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Bass [R] | Sen. Kirk Talbot [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 414 FINAL PASSAGE (#379) (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 414 SB 414 BY BASS (#378) (Y: 16 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 414 SB 414 BY BASS (#378) (Y: 16 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2024-04-24 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 3 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |