LA SB438 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes minimum requirements for a levee commissioner. (8/1/24)
Title
Establishes minimum requirements for a levee commissioner. (8/1/24)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 438 FINAL PASSAGE (#399) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2024-04-29 | House | Reported with amendments (10-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-04-25 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2024-04-24 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |