LA SB457 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Reported favorably (13-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Reported favorably (13-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for economic development districts in East Baton Rouge Parish. (gov sig)
Title
Provides for economic development districts in East Baton Rouge Parish. (gov sig)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 457 FINAL PASSAGE (#389) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | House | Reported favorably (13-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-04-25 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2024-04-24 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |