LA SB476 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Criminalizes the use of bait dogs in the training process for dog fighting. (8/1/24) (EG1 SEE FISC NOTE LF RV See Note)
Title
Criminalizes the use of bait dogs in the training process for dog fighting. (8/1/24) (EG1 SEE FISC NOTE LF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Owen [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 476 FINAL PASSAGE (#312) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-25 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2024-04-24 | House | Reported with amendments (10-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-04-17 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2024-04-16 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |