LA SB478 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Reported with amendments (10-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Reported with amendments (10-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for Lafayette Consolidated Government Employees. (8/1/24) (RE -$77,000 FC SG RV)
Title
Provides for Lafayette Consolidated Government Employees. (8/1/24) (RE -$77,000 FC SG RV)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 478 FINAL PASSAGE (#289) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | House | Reported with amendments (10-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-04-17 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2024-04-16 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |