LA SB48 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for health insurance coverage of genetic testing for diseases and other medical conditions. (gov sig) (EG NO IMPACT See Note)
Title
Provides for health insurance coverage of genetic testing for diseases and other medical conditions. (gov sig) (EG NO IMPACT See Note)
Sponsors
Sen. Kirk Talbot [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 48 FINAL PASSAGE (#279) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-25 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2024-04-24 | House | Reported favorably (14-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-04-17 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2024-04-16 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted; ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance. |