LA SB497 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amends provisions concerning selection of members of the Board of Ethics. (8/1/24)
Title
Amends provisions concerning selection of members of the Board of Ethics. (8/1/24)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 497 FINAL PASSAGE (#452) (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 27 yeas and 10 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |