LA SB84 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-02 - Effective date 7/1/10.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-02 - Effective date 7/1/10.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requires any employer who exits the Parochial Employees' Retirement System of Louisiana to pay its portion of the liabilities. (7/1/10) (EN SEE ACTUARIAL NOTE APV)
Title
Requires any employer who exits the Parochial Employees' Retirement System of Louisiana to pay its portion of the liabilities. (7/1/10) (EN SEE ACTUARIAL NOTE APV)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House Vote on SB 84, FINAL PASSAGE (#1393) (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 84, FINAL PASSAGE (#169) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 84, FINAL PASSAGE (#169) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-02 | Effective date 7/1/10. | |
2010-07-02 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 870. | |
2010-06-15 | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. | |
2010-06-14 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-06-14 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-06-14 | Received from the House without amendments. | |
2010-06-11 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 88, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-06-04 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/11/2010. | |
2010-06-03 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2010-06-02 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2010-05-27 | Reported favorably (8-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-04-15 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement. | |
2010-04-14 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2010-04-14 | Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-04-13 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage. | |
2010-04-12 | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. | |
2010-03-29 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Retirement. | |
2010-03-15 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Retirement. |