LA SB9 | 2024 | 2nd Extraordinary Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 66-25-1)
Status: Passed on March 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - Effective date 3/5/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 66-25-1)
Status: Passed on March 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - Effective date 3/5/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides time limitations for the initiation of prosecution of certain sex offenses. (gov sig)(Item #22) (EN INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides time limitations for the initiation of prosecution of certain sex offenses. (gov sig)(Item #22) (EN INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-28 - House - House Vote on SB 9 FINAL PASSAGE (#76) (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 9 CO-AUTHORS (#18) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 9 FINAL PASSAGE (#17) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 9 CO-AUTHORS (#18) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 9 FINAL PASSAGE (#17) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-05 | Senate | Effective date 3/5/2024. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 3. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2024-02-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2024-02-28 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 104, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-02-27 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 02/28/2024. |
2024-02-27 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-02-27 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2024-02-26 | House | Reported favorably (14-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-02-23 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2024-02-22 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title; ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |