LA SCR12 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-27 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/23/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-27 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/23/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Arthur Perkins for his substantial legacy of service to his community, particularly his twenty-six years of service on the Denham Springs City Council.
Title
Commends Arthur Perkins for his substantial legacy of service to his community, particularly his twenty-six years of service on the Denham Springs City Council.
Sponsors
Sen. Dale Erdey [R] | Sen. Rogers Pope [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 12 ADOPT (#10) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-27 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/23/2015. |
2015-04-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2015-04-20 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2015-04-15 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |