LA SCR139 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 89-51-4)
Status: Passed on June 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 89-51-4)
Status: Passed on June 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Danny Wilson upon his retirement from AT&T.
Title
Commends Danny Wilson upon his retirement from AT&T.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 139 ADOPT (#918) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-06 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2019. |
2019-06-06 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2019-06-05 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2019-06-05 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered engrossed and sent to the House. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |