LA SCR26 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/30/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/30/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Major Luraine Richard on her retirement from the Lafayette Police Department.
Title
Commends Major Luraine Richard on her retirement from the Lafayette Police Department.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 26 ADOPT (#75) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/30/2021. |
2021-04-28 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2021-04-21 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2021-04-21 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |