LA SCR27 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-27 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/23/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-27 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/23/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Dr. Milton Hughes on his retirement from the Livingston Parish School Board and on 44 years of dedicated public service.
Title
Commends Dr. Milton Hughes on his retirement from the Livingston Parish School Board and on 44 years of dedicated public service.
Sponsors
Sen. Dale Erdey [R] | Sen. Rogers Pope [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 27 ADOPT (#16) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-27 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/23/2015. |
2015-04-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2015-04-20 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2015-04-15 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |