LA SCR27 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-25 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-25 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends LSU employees, students, and leadership and designates Tuesday, April 18, 2017, as LSU Day at the state capitol.
Title
Commends LSU employees, students, and leadership and designates Tuesday, April 18, 2017, as LSU Day at the state capitol.
Sponsors
Sen. Yvonne Dorsey-Colomb [D] | Sen. Dan Claitor [R] | Sen. Barrow Peacock [R] | Rep. Stephen Carter [R] |
Sen. Franklin Foil [R] | Rep. Patricia Smith [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 27 ADOPT (#39) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-25 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2017-04-20 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2017-04-18 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |