LA SCR3 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-29 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/26/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-29 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/26/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Invites the governor to address a joint session of the legislature on Monday, April 8, 2013, at 1:00 p.m.
Title
Invites the governor to address a joint session of the legislature on Monday, April 8, 2013, at 1:00 p.m.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 3, ADOPT (#6) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-29 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/26/2013. |
2013-04-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2013-04-09 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2013-04-08 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and adopted by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |