LA SCR3 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-30 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/27/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-30 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/27/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the Department of Health and Hospitals to submit a report by October 1, 2016, and to add Adrenoleukodystrophy (ALD) to the newborn screening panel no later than August 1, 2017.
Title
Requests the Department of Health and Hospitals to submit a report by October 1, 2016, and to add Adrenoleukodystrophy (ALD) to the newborn screening panel no later than August 1, 2017.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-19 - House - House Vote on SCR 3 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#914) (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 3 ADOPT SCR 3 BY MILLS (#130) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 3 ADOPT SCR 3 BY MILLS (#130) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-30 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/27/2016. |
2016-05-24 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2016-05-23 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2016-05-19 | House | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 77 yeas, 0 nays. |
2016-05-13 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/19/2016. |
2016-05-11 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2016-05-10 | House | Reported favorably (10-0). |
2016-04-06 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2016-04-05 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays; ordered engrossed and sent to the House. |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |