LA SCR69 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 39-18-2)
Status: Passed on May 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-11 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/15/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 39-18-2)
Status: Passed on May 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-11 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/15/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses support of Louisiana students to assemble for religious expression and to express their religious beliefs in public elementary and secondary schools and public postsecondary education institutions.
Title
Expresses support of Louisiana students to assemble for religious expression and to express their religious beliefs in public elementary and secondary schools and public postsecondary education institutions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-03 - House - House Vote on SCR 69 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#734) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-05-19 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 69 ADOPT (#358) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-19 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 69 CO-AUTHORS (#357) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2015-05-19 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 69 ADOPT (#358) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-19 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 69 CO-AUTHORS (#357) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-11 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/15/2015. |
2015-06-07 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2015-06-03 | House | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 98 yeas, 0 nays. |
2015-05-28 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/03/2015. |
2015-05-28 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2015-05-27 | House | Reported favorably (13-0). |
2015-05-21 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2015-05-20 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays; ordered engrossed and sent to the House. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |