LA SR14 | 2020 | 2nd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-21 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 10/16/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-21 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 10/16/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses condolences upon the death of Esther Elizabeth Streng Staats.
Title
Expresses condolences upon the death of Esther Elizabeth Streng Staats.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-21 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 10/16/2020. |
2020-10-13 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2020-10-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |