MA H1067 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to providing insurance coverage for biennial echocardiograms and concussion analyses for persons under eighteen years of age. Financial Services.
Title
Providing insurance coverage for biennial echocardiogram and concussion analysis for persons under the age of 18
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2023-10-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/30/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 and virtual |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H4096 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
H4410 (Similar To) 2024-04-18 - Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4411 (Similar To) 2024-02-20 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
H4410 (Similar To) 2024-04-18 - Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4411 (Similar To) 2024-02-20 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1067 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1067.pdf |