MA H1094 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to expanding coverage of dental procedures. Financial Services.
Title
Expanding coverage of dental procedures
Sponsors
Rep. Paul McMurtry [D] | Sen. Michael Rush [D] | Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R] | Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D] |
Sen. Brendan Crighton [D] | Rep. Dawne Shand [D] | Sen. John Keenan [D] | Sen. Jacob Oliveira [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2023-11-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/05/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 and virtual |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H4096 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
H4410 (Similar To) 2024-04-18 - Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4410 (Similar To) 2024-04-18 - Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1094 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1094.pdf |