MA H1157 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4625
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require restaurants to identify for customers the presence and origin of food allergens contained in the list of products offered by such restaurants. Public Health.
Title
Requiring identification of food allergens in eating establishments
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Frost [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-18 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4625 |
2017-08-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S1272 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2422
H1166 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H3468 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H2438 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H1199 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4682
H4625 (Replaced by) 2018-06-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1166 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H3468 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H2438 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H1199 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4682
H4625 (Replaced by) 2018-06-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1157 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1157.pdf |