MA H1175 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 55-2)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the closing of hospital essential services. Health Care Financing.
Title
Relative to the closing of hospital essential services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-03-28 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 1, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-06-05 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 06/20/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-06-02 | Joint | Location Changed - Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-06-02 | Joint | Location Changed - Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2023 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-05-31 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
S736 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1175 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1175.pdf |