MA H1192 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S748
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-30 - Accompanied S748
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-30 - Accompanied S748
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to protect medically fragile children. Health Care Financing.
Title
To protect medically fragile children
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-30 | Senate | Accompanied S748 |
2023-07-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/25/2023 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
S2476 (Similar To) 2024-01-18 - New draft substituted, see S2550
S748 (Replaced by) 2023-10-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4266 (Similar To) 2024-01-25 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2736 (Similar To) 2024-04-25 - Passed to be engrossed -see Roll Call #134 (Yeas 38 to Nays 0)
H4571 (Similar To) 2024-04-22 - Adopted
S748 (Replaced by) 2023-10-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4266 (Similar To) 2024-01-25 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2736 (Similar To) 2024-04-25 - Passed to be engrossed -see Roll Call #134 (Yeas 38 to Nays 0)
H4571 (Similar To) 2024-04-22 - Adopted
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1192 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1192.pdf |