MA H1199 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-03 - Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-03 - Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to hospital-based violence intervention and prevention services. Health Care Financing.
Title
Relative to using Medicaid for violence prevention and intervention
Sponsors
Rep. Christopher Hendricks [D] | Rep. William Straus [D] | Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [D] | Rep. William Driscoll [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
H1179 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
H1221 (Similar To) 2023-10-03 - Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
S664 (Similar To) 2024-03-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
H1196 (Similar To) 2023-10-03 - Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
H1169 (Similar To) 2023-10-03 - Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
H1221 (Similar To) 2023-10-03 - Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
S664 (Similar To) 2024-03-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
H1196 (Similar To) 2023-10-03 - Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
H1169 (Similar To) 2023-10-03 - Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1199 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1199.pdf |