MA H1210 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a community health center nurse practitioner residency program for the purposes of recruiting and retaining nurse practitioners at community health centers. Health Care Financing.
Title
Promoting workforce development and provider retention at community health centers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-03-28 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 3, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-05-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
S757 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1210 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1210.pdf |