MA H1279 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4615
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-02 - New draft substituted, see H4615
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-02 - New draft substituted, see H4615
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to housing service coordinators. Housing.
Title
Relative to housing service coordinators
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-02 | House | New draft substituted, see H4615 |
2020-04-02 | House | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) |
2020-04-02 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-04-02 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a bill, see H4615 |
2019-06-05 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2019-04-24 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 04/30/2019 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-04-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/30/2019 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in 437 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
H1263 (Similar To) 2020-09-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4975
S1470 (Similar To) 2020-04-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1323 (Similar To) 2020-09-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4975
S778 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2527
H187 (Similar To) 2020-10-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5052
H3696 (Similar To) 2020-04-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 55 of the Acts of 2020
H3979 (Similar To) 2020-02-05 - Amendment (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) adopted, see H4368
H3998 (Similar To) 2019-11-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 118 of the Acts of 2019
S817 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2526
S804 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2526
S2421 (Similar To) 2020-07-24 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S2440 (Similar To) 2019-12-23 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4615 (Replaced by) 2020-04-15 - Reported by H4647
S1470 (Similar To) 2020-04-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1323 (Similar To) 2020-09-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4975
S778 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2527
H187 (Similar To) 2020-10-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5052
H3696 (Similar To) 2020-04-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 55 of the Acts of 2020
H3979 (Similar To) 2020-02-05 - Amendment (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) adopted, see H4368
H3998 (Similar To) 2019-11-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 118 of the Acts of 2019
S817 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2526
S804 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2526
S2421 (Similar To) 2020-07-24 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S2440 (Similar To) 2019-12-23 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4615 (Replaced by) 2020-04-15 - Reported by H4647
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1279 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1279.pdf |