MA H132 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-02 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-02 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to expand the Department of Children and Families definition of mandated reporter. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Relative to mandated reporters
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-02 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-06-02 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-06-02 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2016-05-05 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2016-01-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/09/2016 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
H944 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H1032 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
H2056 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
H945 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H943 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H1032 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
H2056 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
H945 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H943 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H132 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H132.pdf |