MA H1447 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4326
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4326
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4326
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the roles and responsibilities of the Victim and Witness Assistance Board. The Judiciary.
Title
To modernize the roles and responsibilities of the victim and witness assistance board
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Day [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-08 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4326 |
2023-09-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S995 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4326
H4326 (Replaced by) 2024-02-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4326 (Replaced by) 2024-02-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1447 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1447.pdf |