MA H146 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S72
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
Pending: Joint Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
Pending: Joint Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to ensuring access to behavioral health services for children involved with state agencies. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Ensuring access to behavioral health services for children involved with state agencies
Sponsors
Rep. Marjorie Decker [D] | Rep. Samantha Montano [D] | Rep. David Linsky [D] | Rep. Natalie Higgins [D] |
Rep. Tram Nguyen [D] | Rep. Patricia Duffy [D] | Rep. Bill MacGregor [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | House | Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
2024-02-15 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2024-02-15 | House | Accompanied by S72 |
2023-09-07 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 09/12/2023 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-09-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2023 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
S72 (Replaces) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied H146
H1145 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
H1167 (Similar To) 2023-10-03 - Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
H1108 (Similar To) 2024-04-03 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
S759 (Similar To) 2023-10-03 - Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
H1242 (Similar To) 2023-10-03 - Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
H1145 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
H1167 (Similar To) 2023-10-03 - Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
H1108 (Similar To) 2024-04-03 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
S759 (Similar To) 2023-10-03 - Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
H1242 (Similar To) 2023-10-03 - Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H146 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H146.pdf |