MA H1503 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4706
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish penalties for landlords knowingly providing premises to be used for illegal drug purposes. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to landlords accountability with regard to drug houses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-24 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4706 |
2015-10-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/03/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H4706 (Replaced by) 2016-10-24 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2632 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H2631 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H2630 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H2633 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H2796 (Similar To) 2016-02-25 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2632 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H2631 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H2630 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H2633 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H2796 (Similar To) 2016-02-25 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1503 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1503.pdf |