MA H1516 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5081
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the failure to appear in court due to enrollment in rehabilitation or detoxification facilities. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to a person’s failure to appear in court due to enrollment in rehabilitation or detoxification facility
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-12 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5081 |
2019-10-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/22/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H1376 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H2715 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
H3319 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S919 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S853 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H3477 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3439 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S969 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S837 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S881 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S2237 (Similar To) 2019-07-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 38 of the Acts of 2019
H5081 (Replaced by) 2020-11-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2715 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
H3319 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S919 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S853 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H3477 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3439 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S969 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S837 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S881 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S2237 (Similar To) 2019-07-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 38 of the Acts of 2019
H5081 (Replaced by) 2020-11-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1516 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1516.pdf |