MA H1599 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5170
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5170
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5170
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to eliminate the charitable immunity defense in certain court actions. The Judiciary.
Title
To eliminate the charitable immunity cap
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-01 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5170 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-03 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday April 15, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-09-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/15/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S1101 (Similar To) 2022-04-19 - Accompanied a study order, see S2838
H5170 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5170 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1599 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1599.pdf |