MA H1601 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to adults with disabilities in family and juvenile court proceedings. The Judiciary.
Title
Prohibiting discrimination against adults with disabilities in family and juvenile court proceedings
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-01 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-05 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday April 30, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-11-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/14/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S2460 (Similar To) 2024-03-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4124 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4124 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1601 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1601.pdf |