MA H1642 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 455 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 455 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to designate the courthouse in Westfield as the John Greaney Courthouse. The Judiciary.
Title
Designating the Westfield division of the district court of western Hampden as the John M. Greaney Courthouse
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-13 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 455 of the Acts of 2016 | |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2016-12-29 | House | Enacted |
2016-12-29 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2016-12-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2016-12-27 | Senate | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2016-12-27 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2016-07-28 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-07-28 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2016-06-15 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-06-15 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-06-15 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2016-05-19 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-03-14 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday May 2, 2016, pending concurrence |
2015-05-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/27/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H2840 (Similar To) 2016-05-18 - New draft substituted, see H4308
H1641 (Similar To) 2015-11-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 128 of the Acts of 2015
H3107 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4612
H2077 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
H3455 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1641 (Similar To) 2015-11-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 128 of the Acts of 2015
H3107 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4612
H2077 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
H3455 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1642 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1642.pdf |