MA H1739 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S900
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 64-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-05 - Accompanied S900
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-05 - Accompanied S900
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish earned paid sick time for certain employees rendering personal care. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Establishing earned paid sick time
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-05 | Senate | Accompanied S900 |
2014-04-22 | House | House concurred |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Amendment (changing reporting date to Thursday May 01, 2014) adopted, pending concurrence |
2014-03-20 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday July 31, 2014, pending concurrence |
2013-07-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2013 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in B-1 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
S900 (Replaced by) 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H1739 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H1739.pdf |