MA H1860 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2605
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2605
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2605
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to include bone marrow and organ donation in the paid family and medical leave program. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Relative to PFML for bone marrow and organ donation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-04 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2605 |
2023-10-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/24/2023 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
H1859 (Similar To) 2024-03-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2605
H1858 (Similar To) 2024-03-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2605
H2333 (Similar To) 2024-04-25 - Senate concurred
S2605 (Replaced by) 2024-03-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1858 (Similar To) 2024-03-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2605
H2333 (Similar To) 2024-04-25 - Senate concurred
S2605 (Replaced by) 2024-03-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1860 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1860.pdf |