MA H1886 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4502
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require the Department of Highways to acquire a certain portion of Brook Street and Willet Pond Dam in the town of Norwood by eminent domain. Transportation.
Title
Authorizing the Department of Highways to acquire a certain dam in the town of Norwood
Sponsors
Rep. John Rogers [D] | Rep. Paul McMurtry [D] | Rep. Paul Heroux [D] | Sen. Walter Timilty [D] |
Rep. Daniel Hunt [D] | Sen. James Timilty [D] | Sen. Michael Rush [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-17 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4502 |
2017-05-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/17/2017 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S1984 (Similar To) 2018-02-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H3748 (Similar To) 2017-10-04 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H3940
H3940 (Similar To) 2018-01-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 14 of the Acts of 2018
H4185 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4614
H4502 (Replaced by) 2018-05-17 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4614 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Chapter 149 of the Acts of 2018
H4718 (Similar To) 2018-11-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 301 of the Acts of 2018
H3748 (Similar To) 2017-10-04 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H3940
H3940 (Similar To) 2018-01-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 14 of the Acts of 2018
H4185 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4614
H4502 (Replaced by) 2018-05-17 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4614 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Chapter 149 of the Acts of 2018
H4718 (Similar To) 2018-11-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 301 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1886 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1886.pdf |