MA H1986 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-7-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-30 - Hearing scheduled for 11/06/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Mental Health, Substance Abuse and Recovery Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-30 - Hearing scheduled for 11/06/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Mental Health, Substance Abuse and Recovery Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Representative Garlick of Needham, a petition of Denise C. Garlick and others for an investigation by a special commission (including members of the General Court) to promote safe social media use, identify best practices for social media platforms to safeguard children’s mental health, and develop guidelines for safe social media use. Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery.
Title
Resolve relative to children’s mental health in social media
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/06/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery |
Same As/Similar To
H82 (Similar To) 2023-12-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2539
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1986 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1986.pdf |