MA H2139 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-27 - Hearing scheduled for 07/06/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-27 - Hearing scheduled for 07/06/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to patient access to certain health care services. Public Health.
Title
To increase patient access to certain health care services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/06/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H1195 (Similar To) 2024-04-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1160 (Similar To) 2023-06-12 - Hearing scheduled for 06/26/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 and virtual
H1184 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
H2251 (Similar To) 2023-04-25 - Hearing scheduled for 05/04/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
H1160 (Similar To) 2023-06-12 - Hearing scheduled for 06/26/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 and virtual
H1184 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
H2251 (Similar To) 2023-04-25 - Hearing scheduled for 05/04/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2139 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2139.pdf |