MA H2149 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4611
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4611
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4611
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the renewal fee for firearm identification cards for persons over the age of 64. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Relative to senior gun owner equity
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-15 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4611 |
2016-01-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/28/2016 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
H4611 (Replaced by) 2016-09-15 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1854 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H100 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H1439 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1440 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H2777 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H1854 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H100 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H1439 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1440 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H2777 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2149 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2149.pdf |