MA H2245 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S1408
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to strengthen the direct care and dementia workforce. Public Health.
Title
To strengthen the direct care and dementia workforce
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-03-28 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 3, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-03-25 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2024-03-25 | House | Accompanied by S1408 |
2023-06-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/06/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H2314 (Similar To) 2024-04-25 - Senate concurred
H1775 (Similar To) 2023-11-28 - Hearing scheduled for 12/05/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H1431 (Similar To) 2023-06-20 - Hearing scheduled for 06/27/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H1033 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
H4387 (Similar To) 2024-02-26 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1408 (Replaces) 2024-03-25 - Accompanied H2245
H1775 (Similar To) 2023-11-28 - Hearing scheduled for 12/05/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H1431 (Similar To) 2023-06-20 - Hearing scheduled for 06/27/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H1033 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
H4387 (Similar To) 2024-02-26 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1408 (Replaces) 2024-03-25 - Accompanied H2245
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2245 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2245.pdf |