MA H2248 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S1531
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-24 - Accompanied S1531
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-24 - Accompanied S1531
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to disability pensions for violent crimes committed against certain public employees. Public Service.
Title
Relative to disability pensions for violent crimes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-24 | Senate | Accompanied S1531 |
2019-09-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/01/2019 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S1544 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1543 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H2196 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2197 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2680 (Similar To) 2019-10-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2386 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H638 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H1374 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1531 (Replaced by) 2019-10-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1543 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H2196 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2197 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2680 (Similar To) 2019-10-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2386 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H638 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H1374 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1531 (Replaced by) 2019-10-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2248 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2248.pdf |