MA H2262 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Hearing scheduled for 02/06/2024 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Hearing scheduled for 02/06/2024 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the board of registration in podiatry within the board of registration in medicine. Public Health.
Title
Enhancing podiatric profession's registration and oversight
Sponsors
Rep. John Rogers [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/06/2024 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-06-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/12/2023 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-04-06 | House | Discharged to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S1453 (Similar To) 2024-02-01 - Accompanied H2150
S164 (Similar To) 2024-02-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2630
H2150 (Similar To) 2024-02-01 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
S164 (Similar To) 2024-02-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2630
H2150 (Similar To) 2024-02-01 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2262 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2262.pdf |