MA H2339 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the reduction of certain toxic chemicals in firefighter personal protective equipment. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Relative to the reduction of certain toxic chemicals in firefighter personal protective equipment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-04-11 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 8, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday April 8, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-09-06 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 09/13/2023 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2023-09-06 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 09/13/2023 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
S1556 (Similar To) 2024-04-25 - House concurred
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2339 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2339.pdf |